judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY H. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1237
Short Caption:GREGORY H. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:89-CF-1237Consolidated: 91-CF-0393
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1770-89Filed Date:10/20/1989

Opening Event Date:10/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/26/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/25/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/05/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/08/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory H. Jones N
William L. Peters NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Helene Kazanjian YN
RespondentUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, GREGORY H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 91-393 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 4/26/91 ORD: SS, VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF GARY M. SIDELL & APPT NOTE - 03 WILLIAM L. PETERS FOR APLT; NOTE - 03 CNSOLIDATE 89-1237 & 91-393 & NOTE - 04 DKTNG STATE IN 91-393 SHALL NOTE - 04 REMAIN DUE TO BE FL ON 4/29.
10/20/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
01/30/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD R
02/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(10 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(462 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(37 PGS/BURNS)(6 PGS/SALAZAR ) AD PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD RT
03/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD BA
04/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(287 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (114-PGS/RAMOS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TO FILE BRIEF TO THE EXTENT THAT BRIEF BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS JB PANELRBH SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD U
07/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY UNTIL HEARING FOR MO FOR NEW TRIAL AD PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD BA
07/25/1990ORDER STAYING APPEAL PNDG FURTH ORD OF CT; FO COUNSEL TO FILE STMT RE STATUS W/IN 20 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1990STATEMENT OF RE MO IN TRIAL CT AD PANEL SCDATE 081490 SCHPRD STATE
08/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(ORDER JUDGE LONG DATED 7/5/90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRO SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD V
10/23/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: PROCEEDINGS IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 112690 SCHPRD ANSA
10/24/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FILED IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRO SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD V
11/26/1990STATEMENT OF APLT RE: MOTION PENDING IN LOWER CT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1991ORDER COUNS APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010891 SCHPRD V
03/11/1991APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE STATUS OF PENDING MOTION IN TRIAL COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(ORDER MO FOR NEW TRIAL DENIED) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 041191 SCHPRD CHECK
05/14/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (19 PGS/TANNER) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(6-PGS/SCHOCH) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1991RECORD ON APPEAL IN 91-393 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1991ORDER APLT TO FL DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR ATTR REMOVED FROM CJA LIST AD PANELRBH SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD DSA
07/15/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (28 PGS. -- BARIE) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (21 PGS/CARTER) PMB PANEL SCDATE 070191 SCHPRD RT
07/26/1991RECORD COMPLETED
08/02/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 073091 SCHPRD GR
09/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 30, 1991 AJ PANEL SCDATE 091791 SCHPRD BA
10/08/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL BRF GRNTD TO 10/18/91. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 100291 SCHPRD GR
10/21/1991RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 110491 SCHPRD CHECK
11/15/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1991ORDER APLT MO LV TO FL LODGED BRF GRNTD. F/O APLE BRF DUE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 25, 1991. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 110691 SCHPRD GR
11/25/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD BE
11/25/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/23/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT
04/30/1992ORDER: Grant appellant's motion to submit appeal without oral argument. (JAC)
05/05/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/05/1992SUBMITTED FE SC MK
05/14/1992AFFIRMED MOJ - FE SC MK
05/14/1992AFFIRMED
06/08/1992MANDATE ISSUED