judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ISAAC C. HUDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0541
Short Caption:ISAAC C. HUDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9217-86Filed Date:05/20/1987

Opening Event Date:05/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIsaac C. Hudson N
G. Godwin Oyewole YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Oliver W. McDanielYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUDSON, ISAAC C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - OYEWOLEG FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCDANIELO FOR - APPELLEE
05/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/13/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
08/12/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081987 SCHPRD OPE
10/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (185 PGS - MOLLICHELLI) JB PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 4, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD BE
02/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 020488 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1988ORDER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 6/9/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD OPE
06/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/09/1988ARGUED PANELNWSCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWSCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/13/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD