judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHANIEL MCCALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0540
Short Caption:NATHANIEL MCCALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11081-86Filed Date:05/18/1987

Opening Event Date:05/18/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/16/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/23/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNathaniel Mccall N
Joseph R. Conte YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCALL, NATHANIEL UNITED STATES
05/18/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. CONTE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 071787 SCHPRD R
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (285 PGS RONAN) EBP PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
09/14/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS - ABSOLUTELY - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD CHECK
10/16/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/18/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 22RD (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD BE
12/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 122288 SCHPRD BE
05/23/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/23/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD