judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERT MILLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1196
Short Caption:ALBERT MILLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1982-89Filed Date:10/18/1989

Opening Event Date:10/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlbert Mills N
Lawrence M. Baskir NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILLS, ALBERT UNITED STATES
10/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE W/89-1197 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO APPOINT COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY ORDER DISMISSING INDICTMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD R
10/20/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LAWRENCE M. BASKIR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD CHECK
11/01/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD DSA
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MCONA FILED 10-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MO TO EXPED. FILED 10-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MSTA FILED 10-28-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD OPE
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (20 PGS. -- RUST) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989DISMISSED OPINION DISMISSING APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 566 A.2d 1073
12/06/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 3084
12/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD