judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLARENCE R. MINOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1213
Short Caption:CLARENCE R. MINOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6938-88Filed Date:10/10/1989

Opening Event Date:10/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClarence R. Minor N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MINOR, CLARENCE R. UNITED STATES
10/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/26/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT FVH PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD K
12/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSCRIPT (52-PGS/HUNT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD R
05/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6-PGS/EDLEY) AJ J PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/22/1991ORDER APLT MO WITHDRAW APPEAL GRNTD & APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. GR PANELJWR SCDATE 031291 SCHPRD GR
03/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
04/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD