judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAROLYN E. ADAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0549
Short Caption:CAROLYN E. ADAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:87-CF-0549Consolidated: 87-CF-0632 , 87-CF-0654
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3621-86Filed Date:05/18/1987

Opening Event Date:05/18/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/17/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarolyn E. Adams N
Stephen D. ScavuzzoYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Saul M. PilchenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ADAMS, CAROLYN E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 110987 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 01 TO CONSOLIDATE 87-549, 87-632 NOTE - 02 & 87/654; FO: CONS BR OF APLE NOTE - 02 DUE 30 DAYS AFTER APLT BR IS NOTE - 03 FILED IN 87-632. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 CON 87-632 & 87-654 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 11/27/87 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 05 NO. 87-632 FOR LV TO FILE THE NOTE - 06 BRIEF; CLK DIRTD TO FILE NOTE - 06 LODGED APLT'S BRIEF IN NOTE - 07 NO. 87-632. FO THAT THE NOTE - 07 CONSOLIDATED BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 08 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS. NOTE - 08
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PILCHENS FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 88/11/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HARTD FOR - APLT CHAPPELL ATTY 2 - SCAVUZZOS FOR - APLT ADAMS ATTY 3 - WESLEYR FOR - APPELLANT DENT
05/18/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN D. SCAVUZZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/02/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/13/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 071787 SCHPRD R
07/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 4TH JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD BA
09/04/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 090487 SCHPRD BA
09/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (493 PGS - SWAGERTY) FILED IN 87-654 PB PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
10/08/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/5/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 100987 SCHPRD BE
11/09/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110587 SCHPRD BE
11/10/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/17/87 IN 87-632 PB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
11/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-632 (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 87-632 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 8 SL PANELPY SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD CHECK
12/28/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 29TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BE
01/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 29, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1988ORDER APLE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEF 2/29/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD CHECK
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 14, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
03/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/14/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD X
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (43 PGS - SWAGERTY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 24TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BE
03/30/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO SUBSTITUTE PAGE OF BRIEF JB PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-654 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-632 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/17/1988ARGUED PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION...CAUSE RM FOR NEW TRIAL. PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 558 A.2d 348
05/17/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1050
06/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1989LETTER DATED 6/23/89, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, REGARDING STATUS OF CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1989LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE: APLTS 7/5/89 LETTER. DAS PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD