judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAKE BRYANT, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0446
Short Caption:JAKE BRYANT, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4687-86Filed Date:04/21/1987

Opening Event Date:04/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/04/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJake Bryant, Jr.N
Joseph W. Thomas YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRYANT JR., JAKE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/4/88 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 01 FILE BRIEF; CLK DIRTD TO FILE NOTE - 02 LODGED BRIEF AND SCHD CASE FOR NOTE - 02 CONSID. BEF MERITS DIV. AS NOTE - 03 SOON AS BUSINESS OF COURT NOTE - 03 PERMITS.
04/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH W. THOMAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD R
07/01/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS; FOL APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. PANELPY SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
07/22/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS LATE (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (35 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (615 PGS - BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/13/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 17TH JB PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BE
12/15/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (147 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
01/04/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/04/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 JJ PANELPY SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD JJ
05/04/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/04/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/22/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD