judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY M. STREETER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0445
Short Caption:ANTHONY M. STREETER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 87-CF-0393 Consolidated:87-CF-0445
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8265-85Filed Date:04/20/1987

Opening Event Date:04/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/20/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/02/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony M. Streeter N
Page Kennedy YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Craig S. Iscoe YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STREETER, ANTHONY M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-393 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 5/25/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 02 NO. 87-393 AND J. HERBIE NOTE - 03 DIFONZO, ESQ., IS HEREBY APPTD NOTE - 03 AS CNSL FOR APLT IN NO. 87-393 NOTE - 04 FOR THE PURPOSE OF FILING A NOTE - 04 PET. FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI IN NOTE - 05 THE U.S. SUPREME COURT. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/02/02 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SCHEMBERD FOR - APLT JEFFERSON ATTY 2 - KENNEDYP FOR - APLT STREETER ATTY 3 - ISCOEC FOR - APPELLEE
04/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD R
06/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (57 PGS - BURNS)(SEE 87-393 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 081887 SCHPRD RT
07/07/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (13 PGS. - TANNER) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (8 PGS - OLIVER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1,820 PGS - HART) (4 VOLUMES) JB PANEL SCDATE 080687 SCHPRD RT
01/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 31, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030288 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (30 PGS - ALLISON) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (6 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 15, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1988ORDER APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/15/88 - NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD V
04/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041588 SCHPRD BA
04/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 042088 SCHPRD V
05/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-393 EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988ORDER GRANT APLE REQ TO CONS 87-393 & 87-445; CLK TO FILE APLT BR IN 87-393; BE DUE IN 30 DAYS. PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD OPE
06/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 11TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 060888 SCHPRD BE
07/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/10/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BE
07/21/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/10/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD V
08/10/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 9/12/88 IN 87-393 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-393 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO 1-19-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL REPLY BRF OF APLT. DAS PANELROMKTE SCDATE 012489 SCHPRD CHECK
01/30/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/02/1989ARGUED PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1989AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT RV PWOL CONVICTION.. OTHERWISE AF TR CT JUDGMENT PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 558 A.2d 298
04/27/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0719
05/05/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT IN 87-393 TO CORRECT OPINION MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT IN 87-393 FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL TO PREPARE WRIT OF CERT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 5 SL PANELRO SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD OPE
12/20/1989ORDER GRT MO OF APLT TO CORRECT OPIN & FOOTNOTE 5 SHALL BE DELETED FROM THIS CT'S OPIN OF 4/27/89 PANELROTEMK SCDATE 051189 SCHPRD VS
03/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD