judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE G. MUNN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0539
Short Caption:WILLIE G. MUNN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:87-CF-0539Consolidated: 89-CO-0996
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9176-86Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie G. Munn N
Andrew J. DelehantyNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jeanne E. Asherman NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
James A. Meade YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MUNN, WILLIE G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 082787 ORDER: APLT BR DUE IN NOTE - 01 40 DAYS, OR COUNSEL TO FILE NOTE - 02 A MO FOR PREP OF RT W/CLK OF NOTE - 02 SUP CT & SERVE COPY W/THIS CT NOTE - 03 W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 2/4/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 04 FOR APLT TO W/D & ANDREW J.J. NOTE - 05 DELEHANTY VACATED & JEANNE NOTE - 05 ASHERMAN APPTD TO REPRESENT NOTE - 06 APLT; NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL TO NOTE - 06 FL STATE IN 20 DAYS INDICATING NOTE - 07 STATUS OF RT. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 10/12/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 08 TO STAY CASE PENDG DISP OF 23- NOTE - 09 110 MO IN TRL CRT; COUNSEL TO NOTE - 09 FL COPY OF MO W/THIS CRT IN 30 NOTE - 10 DAYS & TO ADVISE THIS CRT ASAP NOTE - 10 AS TO DISP OF 23-110 MO. NOTE - 11 2/21/89 ORD: THAT CNSL FOR NOTE - 11 APLT W/I 30 DAYS SHALL FILE A NOTE - 12 STMT RE STATUS OF MOTION TO NOTE - 12 VACATE PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE NOTE - 13 SEC. 23-110 FILED IN THE NOTE - 13 TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 14 8/18/89 ORD: SS, 87-539 & 89- NOTE - 14 996 ARE CONS; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 15 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & VA- NOTE - 15 CATE APPMT OF JEANNE ASHERMAN NOTE - 16 & APPT MATTHEW LEEFER; APLT NOTE - 16 TO FL DSA IN 89-996 IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 17 NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL TO ADVISE NOTE - 17 CRT IN 20 AS TO STATUS OF 23- NOTE - 18 110 MO FL IN TRL CRT. NOTE - 18 NOTE - 19 CON 89-996 NOTE - 19
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/27 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEEFERM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CACCIAR FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 DELEHANTYA VACATED 2/4/88. ASHERMANJ VACATED 8/18/89
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANDREW J.J. DELEHANTY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
08/27/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD RT
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (346 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
12/16/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD EBP
01/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO WITHDRAW APT. OF COUNSEL & REPLACE COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ANDREW J. DELEHANTY AND ASK APPOINTMENT OF NEW COUNSEL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JEANNE ASHERMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD GG
02/24/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD STATE
03/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (64 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121587 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPEAL PENDING RESOLUTION OF PENDING MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (8 PGS. -- SANBORN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO HOLD CASE IN ABEY; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD Q
06/14/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 12/16,17 & 18 RT FROM CT RPTR RHOADES. (DUPLICATE REQUEST.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
09/14/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HOLD APPEAL IN ABEYANCE UNTIL RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD BA
10/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT OF MOTION TO VACATE PURSUANT TO 23D.C. CODE SEC. 110 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-10. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD Q
11/01/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE & COPY OF MOTION TO VACATE PURSUANT TO 23-110 FILED IN TRIAL COURT MLR PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD ANSA
01/06/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN THE TRIAL CT. (23-110) EBP PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD CHECK
01/13/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF MOTION TO VACATE PURSUANT TO 23-110 RJG PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD STATE
02/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 13 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD N
03/21/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF 23-110 IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(ORDER JUDGE WALTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FL STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING MOTION BEFORE TR. CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF MOTION TO VACATE PURSUANT TO 23-110 RJG PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD STATE
07/26/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14-18. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD Q
09/06/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE REGARDING STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 090789 SCHPRD ANSA
10/13/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD X
11/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 01-6-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD BA
11/27/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQUESTINGS CPYS OF DOCUMENTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/06/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD CHECK
01/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 010690 SCHPRD BA
01/09/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRO SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD V
02/09/1990RECEIVED PRO SE REQUEST FOR FORMS AND CASE STATUS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-29-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BE
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/29/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD K
03/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (EMERGENCY) TWO DAY EXTENSION TO APRIL 2, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032990 SCHPRD BE
04/02/1990APPENDIX OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (23-110 MOTION CLERK CERTIFICATE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL LODGE BRF & CASE SCHD FOR CONSID. AS SOON AS BIZ OF CT PERMITS. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD Q
09/27/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1993RECEIVED - ex-parte motion for production of witness payment records (exhibit A), motion to deem the gvt to have conceded def's motion to compel discovery (exhibit B) & avidavitt of Willie Mun (exhibit C)