judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MUFUTAU I. SANNI V. JIMMY O. ALATISHE

Case Information: 10-CV-0875
Short Caption:MUFUTAU I. SANNI V. JIMMY O. ALATISHEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4851-08Filed Date:07/19/2010

Opening Event Date:07/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/13/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMufutau I. Sanni N
Clarissa T. EdwardsYY
AppelleeJimmy O. Alatishe N
Olivier Denier LongYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY the trial court's 6/18/10 order pending appeal
07/20/2010TMC - appellant's motion for stay - oppo & motion for summary affirmance
07/23/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and aple's oppo to the emergency motion to stay.
07/27/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987) (citing In re Antioch Univ., 418 A.2d 105, 109 (DC 1980). It is *****MORE*****
07/27/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED W/O PREJUDICE to filing a proper motion pursuant to DC App. R. 27, addressing the standard for summary affirmance. It is *****MORE*****
07/27/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GLOBKN) (jl)
08/30/2010 On consideration of this court's order of July 27, 2010, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it apeparing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
08/30/2010DISMISSED
09/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
09/08/2010RECEIVED - statement regarding trancript
09/09/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's motion to re- instate appeal.
09/24/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate this appeal, the opposition thereto, and the lodged statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is (MORE)
09/24/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the lodged statement regarding transcript. It is (MORE)
09/24/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/18/10)
09/24/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will beissued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp
10/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (12-pgs/tape 6/18/10 proc. w/cd attached
10/13/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/20/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AND motion to withdraw as counsel
12/06/2010 On consideration of the motion of Clarissa Thomas Edwards, Esquire, to withdrawn her appearance as counsel of record for appellant and for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of Clarissa Thomas Edwards, Esquire, is granted and her appearance is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 20 days from the date of ther order as to the identity of his new counsel, or whether appellant intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted to the extent that appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW) elp
12/27/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days and Response to this Court's 12/6/10 Order
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to response to this court's order of December 6, 2010, and to file the brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, advise this court as to the identity of his counsel or there he intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time shall be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (ETW) elp
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/14/2011APPENDIX
03/09/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/22/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Glickman, Steadman
11/15/2011FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate