judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEW TRADEWINDS VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34773
Short Caption:NEW TRADEWINDS VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A359770Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann-check no. 0010692.
09/07/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 99-08344
09/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-08970
10/13/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interest. 99-09907
12/20/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP99B-RR/MS/NB 99-12860
01/18/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-00666
01/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.