judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEROME GRIMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0518
Short Caption:JEROME GRIMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:87-CF-0518Consolidated: 88-CF-0570
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5306-79Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJerome Grimes NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Steven M. Buckman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael L. Volkov YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRIMES, JEROME UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 (FE: MI W/ARMED) NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 2/3/88 ORD: DISMISSING APPEAL NOTE - 02 FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AS NOTE - 03 UNTIMELY FILED, SEE BUTLER V. NOTE - 03 U.S., 388 A.2D 883 (D.C. 1978) NOTE - 04 1/11/89 ORD: CLK OF SUPER CRT NOTE - 04 TO RETURN MANDATE ISSUED ON NOTE - 05 2/24/88 IN THIS CASE; SS, CONS NOTE - 05 87-518 & 88-570; STEVEN M. NOTE - 06 BUCKMAN APPTD FOR APLT IN THIS NOTE - 06 CASE & CONS BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 07 IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 CON 88-570 NOTE - 08
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BUCKMANS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - VOLKOVM FOR - APPELLEE
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1987ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYSQ WHY SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LAK OF JURISD AS UNTMLY FLD. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/15/1987RECEIVED ANSWER OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO ORDER 7/1/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD ANSA
08/28/1987RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER OF APLT. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1988LETTER TO APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 AND 3 SL PANELBEST SCDATE 012888 SCHPRD VS
02/24/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REINSTATE THE APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RECALL THE MANDATE AND REINSTATE APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/14/1988LETTER DATED 11/7/88 FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988LETTER LTR TO APLT RE: HIS 11/14/88 LTR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989LETTER DATED 12/29/88 FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN M. BUCKMAN, ESQ. (SEE 88-570 FOR VOUCHER) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELBEST SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD VS
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & BRF OF APLT FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRNJ SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD N
03/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-2-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BE
04/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/24/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD CHECK
05/24/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BE
10/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/9/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD OPE
11/09/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989ARGUED PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/01/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD