judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ODOMS (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44754
Short Caption:ODOMS (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31533 , 37617 , 39553 , 40151 , 40594 , 42284 , 43495 , 44652 , 46049 , 51415 , 54877 , 55642 , 57374 , 59136 , 63188 , 67949 , 68424 , 71384 , 73089
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C056663Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/24/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-03737
03/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. Further, the clerk of the district court shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). Fn3 [The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential. See NRS 176.156(5).] 05-04609
03/18/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on March 4, 2005. 05-05359
04/28/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 10. 05-08431
04/28/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/16/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-11873
07/08/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 05-13597
08/02/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-15317
08/02/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/11/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 4, 2005. 05-15317