judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAYLOR J. ODEMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0512
Short Caption:TAYLOR J. ODEMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5260-83Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/02/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTaylor J. Odems N
Bernard Jay Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Silvia L. Roman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ODEMS, TAYLOR J. AKA RAYMOND SMITH UNITED STATES
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061287 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 081987 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/15/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD BE
10/08/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPTS ARE FILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD BE
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (12 PGS - CURLEY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987ORDER APLE BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD OPA
12/02/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/02/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD BE
04/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/10/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD