judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES R. MAKAL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0521
Short Caption:JAMES R. MAKAL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5999-86Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/15/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/07/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames R. Makal N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kathleen A. Felton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MAKAL, JAMES R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 071588 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 02 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 02 IN 10 DAYS TO PROPERLY ORD RT NOTE - 03 & FILE A STATE INDICATING SUCH NOTE - 03 W/THIS COURT. NOTE - 04 080588 ORDER: DENY APLT MO FOR NOTE - 04 RT W/OUT PREJUDICE TO ITS RE- NOTE - 05 NEWAL BEFORE THE TR CRT FOR NOTE - 05 ITS CONS IN THE 1ST INSTANCE; NOTE - 06 FO: COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DYS NOTE - 06 TO TAKE STEPS TO PROPERLY ORD NOTE - 07 RT & FILE STATE INDICATING NOTE - 07 SUCH W/THIS CT W/IN THAT SAME NOTE - 08 TIME. NOTE - 08
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. GREEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061287 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/15/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/15/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (125 PGS - RHOADES) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (20 PGS - KACAOROWSKI) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(367 PGS. -- HUNT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
12/09/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
01/11/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD OPE
04/19/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 12/28/87 RT FROM CT RPTR HUNT. (DUPLICATE ORDER FOR RT) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD RT
06/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFT RT. GT PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
07/15/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD OPE
07/19/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ORDER TRANS- CRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD STATE
08/05/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD OPE
08/15/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 5TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD STATE
08/29/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD M
09/14/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 29TH ORDER REGARDING MOTION IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD ANS
08/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(55 PGS/EDLEY-TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
09/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FORM 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RE FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD U
12/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(112 PGS/HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 021790 SCHPRD RT
01/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 20 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD BA
01/30/1990RECEIVED OF APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD V
03/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 12, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD BE
04/02/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/12/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD V
04/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-26-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 041290 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/07/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD K
08/30/1990MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT. MEH PANELNWBEWA SCDATE 090590 SCHPRD VS
10/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/04/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWBEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD