Case Information: 44755 | |||
Short Caption: | ESCOBAR (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44762 , 46055 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192004 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 05-03740 | |
04/11/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-06996 | |
05/06/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-07188 | |
05/06/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/16/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2005. | 05-07188 |