judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JIMMY R. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0516
Short Caption:JIMMY R. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0516Consolidated: 87-CF-0587
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8352-86Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/12/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/08/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJimmy R. Johnson N
Eugene M. Bond YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Joan Ann Barton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, JIMMY R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: AUSTIN CARMICHAEL NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 080687 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-516 NOTE - 02 & 87-587; COUNSEL FOR APLTS IN NOTE - 03 15 DAYS TO FILE STATES RE: NOTE - 03 STATUS OF RT, INDICATING NAMES NOTE - 04 OF CT REPORTERS PREPARING RT; NOTE - 04 EXTIMATED # OF PAGES TO BE NOTE - 05 FILED & EXTIMATED COMPLETION NOTE - 05 DATE OF RT. NOTE - 06 CON 87-587 NOTE - 06
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GRAYD FOR - APLT CARMICHAEL ATTY 2 - BONDE FOR - APLT JOHNSON ATTY 3 - BARTONJ FOR - APPELLEE
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EUGENE M. BOND, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
08/06/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080587 SCHPRD RT
08/14/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT STATUS RESPONSE FOR FILING APLT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD STATE
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-587 UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (273 PGS - MOLLICHELLI) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987ORDER GRANT MO & APLTS BRIEFS DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090287 SCHPRD OPE
11/09/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF & LIST JB PANEL SCDATE 111287 SCHPRD BA
11/10/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-587 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111287 SCHPRD BA
12/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(484 PGS. -- MOLLICHELLI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 14TH JB PANEL SCDATE 121687 SCHPRD BE
01/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB 12TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 011488 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 2/12/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD N
02/12/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/12/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 021288 SCHPRD BE
06/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/07/1988ARGUED PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988AFFIRMED AFFIRMING CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD MOJ
06/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/08/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD