judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARK K. GAYDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0496
Short Caption:MARK K. GAYDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1444-83Filed Date:04/28/1987

Opening Event Date:04/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/23/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMark K. Gayden N
Clifford P. Ennist NN
AppellantMark K. Gayden N
Anita Isicson NN
AppellantMark K. Gayden N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Celillianne Green YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GAYDEN, MARK K. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 110287 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 01 STAY BR SCHED ONLY TO EXTENT NOTE - 02 THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 NOTE - 02 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS NOTE - 03 OF MO FOR PREPARATION OF RT NOTE - 03 PENDING IN SUP CT. NOTE - 04 120887 ORDER: SS, VACATE 11/2 NOTE - 04 ORDER; FO: GRANT APLT MO FOR NOTE - 05 EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS NOTE - 05 AFTER RT IS FILED; FO: COUNSEL NOTE - 06 FOR APLT TO INFORM THIS CT NOTE - 06 IMMEDIATELY UPON RESOLUTION IN NOTE - 07 THE TR CT OF THE MO FOR RT. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 12/9/88 ORD: APPMT OF CLIFFORD NOTE - 08 P. ENNIST VACATED & ANITA NOTE - 09 ISICSON APPTD FOR APLT; NOTE - 09 CLIFFORD ENNIST TO TRANSMIT TO NOTE - 10 NEW COUNSEL ALL MATERIAL NOTE - 10 NECESSARY FOR USE IN CASE; NOTE - 11 NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL TO FL NOTE - 11 STATE IN 20 DAYS AS TO THE NOTE - 12 ESTD COMPLETION DATE OF RT NOTE - 12 ORDERED. NOTE - 13 020989 ORDER: GRANT MO TO NOTE - 13 VACATE APPOINTMENT OF ANITA NOTE - 14 ISICSON, ESQ. & APPOINTING NOTE - 14 STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ., AS NOTE - 15 COUNSEL TO REPRESENT APLT ON NOTE - 15 APPEAL; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAY NOTE - 16 AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. NOTE - 16
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WEINBERGS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GREENCE FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 ENNISTC VACATED 12/9/88. ISICSONA VACATED 2/9/89
04/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD R
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CLIFFORD P. ENNIST, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061287 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (555 PGS. - CARTER) PM PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD RT
07/23/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/23/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 1ST (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD BA
10/09/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING PREPARATION OF ADDI- TIONAL TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. VACATED 12/8/87. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD OPE
12/08/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD STATE
01/28/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (19 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD RT
02/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (21 PGS TR - PIRFO) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (13 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (3 PGS - HART) PB PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD RT
12/09/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-12. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PER ORDER 12/9/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD STATE
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(62 PGS/SANBORN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ANITA ISICSON AND TO SUB- STITUTE STEVEN WEINBERG AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13 - 16. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/13/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(78 PGS/CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 10, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BA
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 5/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050489 SCHPRD CHECK
05/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 5, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BA
06/05/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD OPE
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8(27 PGS/EDLEY-TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-13-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 071389 SCHPRD BE
07/25/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/13/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD X
08/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 29TH JB PANEL SCDATE 081389 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD M
12/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1989ARGUED PANELBETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1990LETTER FROM APLT RE STATUS OF CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 11/6/90 LTR FROM COUNSEL TO DIVISION. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. (PET FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 584 A.2d 578
12/28/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 3914
01/11/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIAJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied
09/25/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 6/13/91 (COPY) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD