Case Information: 40899 | |||
Short Caption: | KIRKWOOD (DARELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45483 , 46621 , 46819 , 48254 , 49271 , 49307 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFO011052 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/06/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/06/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-02166 | |
02/06/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: January 27, 2003. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. Filed in district court on: February 3, 2003. | 03-02167 | |
02/26/2003 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: January 27, 2003. Court Reporter: Suzanne B. Stringfield. | 03-03179 | |
03/17/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 25, 2003. | 03-04399 | |
03/26/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-05105 | |
03/26/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-05107 | |
04/09/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-05970 | |
05/07/2003 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Agreement to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal pursuant to Rule 42 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. | 03-07765 | |
07/16/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Counsel for appellant has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal voluntarily. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Good cause appearing, the motion is granted, and we hereby "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Because no remittitur will issue in this matter, see NRAP 42(b), the one-year period for filing a post-conviction habeas corpus petition under NRS 34.726(1) shall commence to run from the date of this order.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-12001 | |
07/16/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |