judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRY STEADMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0495
Short Caption:TERRY STEADMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F41135-76Filed Date:04/29/1987

Opening Event Date:04/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/23/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerry Steadman N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppellantTerry Steadman N
Kenneth H. RosenauNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
W. Mark Nebeker YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STEADMAN, TERRY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/17/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS & NOTE - 02 APPT STEVEN WEINBERG TO NOTE - 02 REPRESENT APLT ON APPEAL;NEWLY NOTE - 03 APPT'D COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL NOTE - 03 A STATE IN 20 DAYS INDICATING NOTE - 04 WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDERED & NOTE - 04 PREPARED FOR THIS APPEAL.
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1906 ROSENAUK APPROPRIATE MOTION
04/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/25/1987LETTER TO APLT RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL & AFFIDAVIT (FORM 5) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 6-25-87 LETTER & AFFIDAVIT (FORM 5) JB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD ANSA
07/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 071687 SCHPRD CHECK
08/06/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO JULY 17TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 080787 SCHPRD STATE
08/17/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS; APLE BR DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD CHECK
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOV. 27TH (N0 OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BA
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 11/27/87-NFX. EBP EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD CHECK
11/25/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 31ST (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 112787 SCHPRD BA
12/01/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120487 SCHPRD CHECK
12/11/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB (LIST RECVD 12/18/87) PANEL SCDATE 121187 SCHPRD BA
01/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/11/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011587 SCHPRD BE
02/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 15, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 021188 SCHPRD BE
02/24/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 3/15/88- NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021988 SCHPRD M
03/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD BE
07/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/28/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) KENNETH H. ROSENAU, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER GRANT PRO SE MO & KENNETH ROSENAU APPTD & TO FL APPROP MO IN 20 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD OPE
09/02/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDER EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/02/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988RECEIVED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE MO FOR EB CONSIDERATION AND CLK DIRTD TO FILE LODGED PET. PANELPY SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD OPE
09/23/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD