judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN E. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0448
Short Caption:KEVIN E. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7761-86Filed Date:04/17/1987

Opening Event Date:04/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/27/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/27/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin E. Williams N
Michael H. Hoffman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Craig S. Iscoe YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, KEVIN E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: STEPHEN EUGENE DARBY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 7/13/87 ORD: SS THIS CRT'S NOTE - 02 ORD OF 7/8/87 IS VACATEDL CLK NOTE - 03 TO FL LODGED DSA; COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 03 APLT TO FL STATE IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 04 INDICATING WHETHER RT WILL BE NOTE - 04 ORDERED & PREPARED FOR THIS NOTE - 05 APPEAL. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 2/23/89 - GRANT MO OF APLE TO NOTE - 06 AMEND OPINION & TO ADD THE NOTE - 07 FOLLOWING LANGUAGE: UNDER NOTE - 07 D.C. CODE 11-944 (1981), WHICH NOTE - 08 RESULTED IN A SENTENCE OF $25 NOTE - 08 OR ONE DAY IN JAIL.
04/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL H. HOFFMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 061687 SCHPRD R
06/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO JUNE 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
06/30/1987RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL DOCK. STATE IN 10 DAYS. VACATED 7/13 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD OPE
07/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD DSA
07/20/1987STATEMENT OF APLT REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (386 PGS - SIMMS) PB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
10/16/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 30TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 30TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/30/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD X
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 013088 SCHPRD BA
02/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD BE
04/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/3/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
04/25/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF ON OR BEF 5/3/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD N
04/27/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/27/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 050388 SCHPRD BE
05/12/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO JUNE 12TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1988SUBMITTED PANELBETERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELBETERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 552 A.2d 1255
12/29/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 2681
01/12/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLEE TO AMEND OR MODIFY OPINION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND, ETC. TO 2/23/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO TO EXTENT OPPO DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELBETERY SCDATE 012489 SCHPRD OPA
02/08/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO AMEND OPINION AD PANEL SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD OPA
02/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-08. DAS PANELBETERY SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD VS
02/27/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD