judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICARDO E. HUNTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1230
Short Caption:RICARDO E. HUNTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F68869-76Filed Date:09/25/1989

Opening Event Date:09/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/17/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/30/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicardo E. Hunter NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas G. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUNTER, RICARDO E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE ALSO 81-1632 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 11/28/89 ORD: PREPARE & TRANS NOTE - 02 RECORD FORTHWITH; BA DUE 40 NOTE - 03 DAYS AFTER RECORD ON APPEAL NOTE - 03 DOCKETED
09/25/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/20/1989LETTER OF APPELLANT, PRO SE RE: TRANSMITTAL OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS; FO CLK, SUPER CT, TO (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 & 3) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD DSA
12/11/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT (PRO-SE) FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-20-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1990LETTER IN RE TO MXBA AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD NO RTC PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
01/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER DENYING MOT FOR APTMT OF CNSL; FO CLK DIRED TO FILE LODGED BR FO BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 14, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/14/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD B
06/14/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BE
06/20/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, INFORM ING THE COURT OF NON-RECEIPT OF PLDGS FROM USAO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/30/1990SUBMITTED PANELBESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESCKE SCDATE 103090 SCHPRD RDEC
11/20/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -KN CITE
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD