judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VEGAS 2000 VS. MALIBU DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Case Information: 34774
Short Caption:VEGAS 2000 VS. MALIBU DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A397830Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Blumen, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woods & Erickson-check no. 7882.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08350
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Frasier Blumen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/20/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant's Certificate of Compliance with NRAP 9(a). 99-08893
11/17/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11403
12/16/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement; 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-12715
12/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-13320
01/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address. 00-00050
01/12/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 1/11/00. 00-00493
01/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-00494
02/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent, Mark Twain's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-02195
02/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/10/00. (Mark Twain Answering Brief.) 00-02267
02/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/9/00. (Respondents Malibu Dev. And Gary Lee) 00-02280
02/22/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Mark Twain's Motion to Dismiss. 00-02725
03/13/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/10/00. 00-03923
05/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99C-CY/DA/ML 00-08860
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10371
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 2000. 00-10371