judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBBIE JAMES MONDRELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-29)
Case Number:06-29Case Docketed On:02/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:ROBBIE JAMES MONDRELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBBIE JAMES MONDRELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobbie James Mondrell Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/15/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/29/2006Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
06/29/2006Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
06/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/29/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/18/2006Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw (Ryan Roden), conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
09/22/2006Opinion - Published order - Order affirming the District Court's "order denying defendant's motion to correct illegal sentence".OpinionPublished orderFinal
09/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/22/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/22/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/26/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal