judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TINA MARIE THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0876
Short Caption:TINA MARIE THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-5394-10Filed Date:07/13/2010

Opening Event Date:07/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTina M. Thomas YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela Pegram Saffoe NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond J. Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond J. Rigat, Esquire
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (59 pgs/tape) 6/22/10 proc. w/CD
08/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/17/2010RECORD INDEX
08/17/2010RECORD COPIES
08/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Status report filed 5/5/10) ****SEALED
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8 pgs/tape) 6/24/10 proc. w/cd
09/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
09/22/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/22/2010APPENDIX
10/26/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/27/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
12/22/2010On consideration of appellee's motion for summary affirmance, appellant's brief and reply brief and the record on appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the judgment on appeal is affirmed. (see order)(THOBFA)
12/22/2010AFFIRMED
01/05/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
07/29/2014FiledMandate