judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND L. HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1214
Short Caption:RAYMOND L. HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7943-88Filed Date:10/13/1989

Opening Event Date:10/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/21/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/23/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/30/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/27/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaymond L. Harris N
Anita Josey YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Steven N. Gersten NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, RAYMOND L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/30 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JOSEYA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GERSTENS FOR - APPELLEE
10/13/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE DSA; APLT'S BRF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD COMPLETE. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD M
12/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 121289 SCHPRD R
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (228-PGS/HAWKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 041590 SCHPRD RT
05/21/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD CHECK
05/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(202 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 041490 SCHPRD RT
05/21/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-1-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-01-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD GR
08/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO BRF & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080890 SCHPRD B
09/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-26-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 091390 SCHPRD BE
09/26/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 10/10/90 (NO OPP) JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MOS X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; SCHED FOR CONSID. AS SOON AS CAL. PERMITS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 101890 SCHPRD B
10/23/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO LATE FILE RBA; AND GRANT MOT TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. MEH PANELSTWAMK SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD VS
01/24/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/30/1991ARGUED PANELSTWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1992LETTER of appellant in re to the status of his case.
11/17/1992LETTER to appellant in response to his letter dated November 2, 1992. (JAC)
12/18/1992AFFIRMED
01/27/1993MANDATE ISSUED