Case Information: 44781 | |||
Short Caption: | HARRIS (GREGORY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40344 , 40475 , 46387 , 59238 , 62706 , 64137 , 67545 , 67545-COA , 67734 , 67734-COA , 72504 , 72504-COA , 73059 , 74456 , 74456-COA , 77273 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C181588 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/01/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/01/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-04006 | |
03/10/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 05-04838 | |
03/22/2005 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 03/10/05 addressed to Gregory Harris returned. No forwarding address. | ||
04/01/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-06494 | |
04/26/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-06744 | |
04/26/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/05/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 28, 2005. | 05-06744 | |
05/10/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. received on March 30, 2005. This court denies the relief requested as moot. | 05-09083 |