judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD E. WEST V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1212
Short Caption:RONALD E. WEST V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5913-88Filed Date:10/06/1989

Opening Event Date:10/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/28/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/28/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/14/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald B. West N
Carl V. AngelisNY
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Bernadette SargeantNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WEST, RONALD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902APLT'S PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/14/90 ORD: GRANT MO TO NOTE - 01 VACATE APPMT OF JAMES KLEIN & NOTE - 02 APPT CALVIN STEINMETZ FOR APLT NOTE - 02 ON APPEAL; JAMES KLEIN TO GIVE NOTE - 03 TO NEW COUNSEL ALL PAPERS NOTE - 03 NECESSARY FOR CASE; NEWLY APPT NOTE - 04 COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN 20 AS NOTE - 04 TO STATUS OF RT ORDERED. NOTE - 05 10/31/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 05 BY 12/24/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 06 BY 1/28/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 06 2/19/91; SCHED CASE ON APRIL NOTE - 07 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 12/10/91 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO NOTE - 08 FOR APPTMT OF COUNSEL AND NOTE - 09 CARL V. ANGELIS, ESQ., IS NOTE - 09 HEREBY APPTD AS COUNSEL TO NOTE - 10 REPRESENT APLT ON THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 10 FURTH ORD THAT THE MO TO EXT NOTE - 11 TM TO FILE PETITION IS GRTD NOTE - 11 AND NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL SHALL NOTE - 12 FILE A PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC NOTE - 12 WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE NOTE - 13 OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 13
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/04/01 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STEINMETZC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SARGEANTB FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 2/14/90 ANGELISC PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC
10/06/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT FVH PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD R
12/11/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS PDS TO WITHDRAW FROM APLT AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD GG
02/15/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (444-PGS/TANNER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 042190 SCHPRD RT
02/27/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR WRAY CERTIFICATION OF 5/30/88 - 5/31/88 PROCEEDING (ORDER CANCELLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 030690 SCHPRD STATE
03/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (28 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (749-PGS/BURNS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990ORDER APPELLANT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE RT IS FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD U
06/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(48-PGS/GOAD) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (117 PGS. -- SALAZAR) RJG PANEL SCDATE 081490 SCHPRD RT
09/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (33-PGS/BURNEY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD RT
09/28/1990RECORD COMPLETED
10/31/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD B
12/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122490 SCHPRD BA
12/26/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & BRF OF APLT IS FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 012891 SCHPRD BE
01/28/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/13/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLEE TO ADJUST ORDER OF ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991MEMORANDUM NOTE: CASE TO BE ARGUED LAST PER MOT REQUEST. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 032591 SCHPRD OPA
04/01/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/01/1991ARGUED PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM (TWO COUNTS OF FELONY MURDER VACATED) PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE
11/13/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 3488
11/26/1991RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CARL V. ANGELIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 13 SL PANELRO SCDATE 120991 SCHPRD OPE
01/09/1992MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 010992 SCHPRD MRRB
01/14/1992ORDER GRNT APLT'S UNOPPOSED MO FOR EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB ON OR BEFORE 1/29/92. CKT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1992MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APPELLANT TO 2/10/92 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012992 SCHPRD MXRRB
02/03/1992ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO. TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE ON OR BEFORE 2/10/92 SL PANELRO SCDATE 021092 SCHPRD CHECK
02/12/1992MOTION FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1992RECEIVED PETITION FOR REHEARING AND/OR REHEARING EN BANC. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1992PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT FLD CKT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1992ORDER GRNT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC & CLK IS DRTD TO FL LDGD PET. CKT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1992ORDER directing appellee within 20 days from the date of this order to file a response (10 copies) to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. (RO)
04/09/1992APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEto APRIL 23, 1992 (NO OPPO)
04/14/1992ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to April 23, 1992. (RO)
04/23/1992APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to petition for rehearing & or rehearing en banc
07/31/1992LETTER of aplt status of petition for rehearing and or enbanc
08/04/1992LETTER to counsel for appellant in response to his letter dated July 28, 1992, regarding status of petition for reh/reh en banc. (JAC)
09/30/1992ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (Judge Farrell has recused himself from this case) (EB)
10/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED
09/14/1999RECEIVED - letter from aplt want to get case back in trial court
09/23/1999LETTER to appellant in response to his letter of 9/14. (JAC)