judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT SINGLETON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0543
Short Caption:ROBERT SINGLETON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12323-86Filed Date:05/27/1987

Opening Event Date:05/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/25/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/26/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Singleton N
Gary L. Segal YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Oscar S. Mayers YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SINGLETON, ROBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DARRELL L. LAWRENCE NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/09/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SEGALG FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MAYERSO FOR - APPELLEE
05/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GARY L. SEGAL, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 061987 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER TRIAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 081987 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE STAT OF RT. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD OPE
09/15/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 091687 SCHPRD STATE
12/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(230 PGS. -- LEWIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2( 47 PGS TR - TAPE ) GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/07/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(93 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 051588 SCHPRD RT
12/01/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-4-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD BE
01/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITIONTO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPA
01/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL OPPO TO MXBE;GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/4.DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD OPE
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/4/89. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/4/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 020489 SCHPRD BE
02/21/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/4/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD N
03/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 13, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 030489 SCHPRD BE
03/13/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD OPA
03/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AND SUBSTITUTE CORRECTED COPY OF APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF **CORRECTED COPY** DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & BRF OF APLE FL;SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS.DS PANELRBH SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/25/1989ARGUED PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/26/1989MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD