judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH E. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0556
Short Caption:JOSEPH E. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:87-CF-0556Consolidated: 89-CO-0223
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1925-87Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/07/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph E. Smith N
Thomas G. Ross YN
AppellantJoseph E. Smith N
Thomas G. Ross NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, JOSEPH E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-223 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 4/28/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 02 LV TO FILE ANSW TO 3/1/89 ORD. NOTE - 03 AND CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE NOTE - 03 LODGED STMT OF APLT IN NOTE - 04 NO. 87-556. FO THAT THE NOTE - 04 CONSOL. BRF OF APLT SHALL BE NOTE - 05 FILED W/I 30 DAYS AFTER THE NOTE - 05 COMPLETE RECORD INCL. RPTR'S NOTE - 06 TRANSCRIPT IS FILED WITH THIS NOTE - 06 COURT. NOTE - 07 5/9/90 ORD: APPEAL SHOULD NOT NOTE - 07 BE CONSIDERED ON THE RECORD ON NOTE - 08 APPEAL & APLT'S BRIEF ALONE. NOTE - 08
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROSST FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1987ORDER NO. 87-659 IS DISMISSED AS DUPLICATIVE OF NO. 87-556. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD OPE
08/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1987MISCELLANEOUS SUPPLEMENTAL DSA. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MOS,CLK TO FILE LDG DSA, & SUP DSA; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(231 PGS. -- JANIFER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
12/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 13, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BA
01/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/13/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/13/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD X
02/08/1988RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 26TH JB PANEL SCDATE 021388 SCHPRD BA
03/10/1988ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD X
03/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS JB PANEL SCDATE 032188 SCHPRD BA
05/09/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO STAY PENDG 23-110 MO;COUNSEL TO INFORM CRT IN 20 DAYS OF DISP. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD Q
05/20/1988STATEMENT OF APT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988LETTER DATED 6/29/88 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988RECEIVED FURTHER STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF PENDING 23-110 MO IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD CHECK
07/14/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO ADVISE CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO. PDG IN TRIAL CT SL PANELPY SCDATE 070788 SCHPRD N
09/20/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/7-14-88 ORDER OR VACATE APPNTMNT & REF TO BPR. PANELPY SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD CHECK
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 9/20/88 ORDER GT PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD ANS
10/12/1988STATEMENT (ADDENDUM) OF APPELLANT RE STATUS OF PENDING 23-110 MO- TION MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING 23-110 MOTION IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988RECEIVED STATE FROM THOMAS ROSS RE: 23-110 MOTION BEFORE JUDGE KING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1988ORDER CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO ADVISE CT RE STATUS OF SEC. 23-110 MO PDG IN TRIAL CT SL PANELRO SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD N
12/28/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 12/8/88 RE STATUS OF PENDING MOTION IN TRIAL COURT MLR PANEL SCDATE 011089 SCHPRD ANSA
03/01/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. (23-110) EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 020189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/14/1989RECEIVED STATEMENT TO 3-1-89 ORDER RE STATUS OF TRIAL COURT MOTION (NEED MOTION FOR LATE FILE) AD PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD STATE
03/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 3-1-89 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD CHECK
03/24/1989ORDER SS, CONS 87-556 & 89-223; THOMAS ROSS APPTD FOR APLT; APLT IN 890223 TO FL DSA IN 10 PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1989ORDER DIRG APLT IN NO. 89-223 TO FL DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VAC. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-223 JB PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
04/28/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 6 SL PANELRO SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD OPE
04/28/1989STATEMENT OF APLT IN RESPONSE TO 3/1/89 ORDER SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(128 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-223 AD PANEL SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD CHECK
08/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-6-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD BA
09/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/6/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD OPE
09/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 5TH JB PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD BA
10/04/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/05/89;NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD M
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-19-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1989ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOT FOR EXT OF TIME & DIRG THAT BA BE FILED W/IN 5 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990LETTER OF APLT RE: CASE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1990ORDER APPELLEE TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS, OR SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS (SEE NOTES 7 & 8) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BE
06/07/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/07/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 060890 SCHPRD BE
11/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/13/1990ARGUED PANELRGNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD