judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CEDRIC M. STOKES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0365
Short Caption:CEDRIC M. STOKES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9666-86Filed Date:04/02/1987

Opening Event Date:04/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/08/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCedric M. Stokes N
David C. Gray YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Richard L. Chamovitz YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STOKES, CEDRIC M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: NANCY BYRD NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 10/3/89 ORD: SS, CONS 87-365 & NOTE - 02 89-1126; DAVID C. GRAY APPTD NOTE - 03 FOR APLT IN 89-1124; APLT TO NOTE - 03 FL DSA IN 89-1124 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 CON 89-1126 NOTE - 04
04/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RT PB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PGS. - RAMOS) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD OPE
12/23/1987LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (455 PGS - BURNEY) PB PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD RT
04/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/4/88 GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BA
05/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD BA
06/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO STAY PENDG DISP OF 23-110 MO;COUNSEL TO INFORM CRT IN 30 OF STATUS. DS PANELPY SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD Q
06/13/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER RE: 23-110 MOTION IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD ANSA
07/22/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD CHECK
07/27/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JULY 22ND ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD STATE
11/08/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TR CT. (23-110) EBP PANELRO SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD CHECK
11/16/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL CRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD STATE
11/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) LETTER REQUESTING A COPY OF THE TRANSCRIPTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988LETTER LTR TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE: APLT'S 11/16/88 LTR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. (23-110) EBP PANELRO SCDATE 121788 SCHPRD CHECK
12/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 12/14/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 122688 SCHPRD STATE
03/01/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. (23-110) EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 020189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/10/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 3/1/89 PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD STATE
06/27/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING MOT BF TR CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER REQUEST STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION FILED IN THE SUPERIOR COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD STATE
10/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 AND 03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD CHECK
10/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-1126 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(46 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-1126 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 5, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 012490 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 3/5/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
03/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH 89-1126 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990ORDER APLT'S MO TO CONSOL APPEALS IS DENIED AS MOOT. BRF OF APLE REMAINS DUE ON 4/9/90. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD M
03/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BE
04/17/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/9/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 041390 SCHPRD V
05/08/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BE
02/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD