judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. JOHN A. EDELEN

Case Information: 86-CO-0110
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. JOHN A. EDELENClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Government Appeal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3681-85Filed Date:12/23/1985

Opening Event Date:12/23/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/09/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/1986
Argued/Submitted:10/30/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn A. Edelen N
William J. Garber YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES EDELEN, JOHN A.
01/01/1906 TOURISHT TTC
12/23/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/09/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/01/1986FiledBriefing Completed
10/30/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/27/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition