judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VINCENT A. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0367
Short Caption:VINCENT A. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7006-85Filed Date:04/02/1987

Opening Event Date:04/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/25/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/08/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVincent A. Johnson N
Barbara E. SosnickYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, VINCENT A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 080687 ORDER: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED; FO: NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO NOTE - 03 FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT, NOTE - 03 INDICATING NAME OF CT RPRTS; NOTE - 04 ESTIMATED NUMBER OF PGS & NOTE - 04 ESTIMATED COMPLETION DATE.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/10/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SOSNICKB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - EVANSS FOR - APPELLEE
04/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA E. SOSNICK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD R
06/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/09/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
08/06/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/14/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 6TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 082687 SCHPRD STATE
03/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (ORDER OF JUDGE W.R. KING DATED 3/16/88) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (17 PGS - SANBORN) JB PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (603 PGS - SALAZAR) GT PANEL SCDATE 060988 SCHPRD RT
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (13 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD RT
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 19, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 062590 SCHPRD BE
07/13/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 07-19-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD GR
07/19/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/19/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071990 SCHPRD BE
10/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990ORDER SS SCHEDULE THIS CASE FOR ORAL ARGUMENT 10/25/90 AT 9:30 AM. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071990 SCHPRD READY
10/24/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO SUPP REC WITH EXH 7 THROUGH 9. MEH PANELROBESC SCDATE 102390 SCHPRD VS
10/25/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/25/1990ARGUED PANELRGBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(ORDER/PER CURIAM DATED 10-24-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 103190 SCHPRD SR
01/17/1991REMANDED ORDER RM CAUSE w/INSTRUCTIONS SET FORTH IN OPINION FILED. PANELRGBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 585 A.2d 766
01/17/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0176
02/08/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD