judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOMEL A. ALLEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0371
Short Caption:LOMEL A. ALLEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 86-CF-1566 Consolidated: 86-CF-1567 , 87-CF-0371, 88-CF-1010 , 88-CF-1578 , 89-CF-0711
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4431-86Filed Date:03/04/1987

Opening Event Date:03/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/25/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLomel A. Allen N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Henry S. Hoberman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALLEN, LOMEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 032488 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-371 NOTE - 01 W/CONS NOS. 86-1566 & 86-1567; NOTE - 02 FO: CLK TO FILE LDGD STATE IN NOTE - 02 87-371; FO: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 03 STATUS OF RT. NOTE - 04 CON 86-1566, 86-1567, 88-1010 NOTE - 04 CON 88-1578, & 89-711 NOTE - 05 8/25/88 ORD:SS, CONS 88-1010 NOTE - 05 W/86-1566,-1567, & 87-371; NOTE - 06 PETER H. MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT NOTE - 06 IN 88-1010; APLT IN 88-1010 TO NOTE - 07 FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 1/5/89 ORD: SS, CONS 88-1578 NOTE - 08 W/86-1566, 87-371 & 88-1010; NOTE - 09 PETER H. MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT NOTE - 09 IN 88-1578; APLT TO FL DSA IN NOTE - 10 88-1578 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 7/7/89 ORD: CLK TO FL BRF OF NOTE - 11 APLT IN 86-1566,-1567, 87-371, NOTE - 12 88-1010, & -1578; SS, CONS NOTE - 12 89-711 W/86-1566, -1567, 87- NOTE - 13 371, 88-1010, & -1578; PETER NOTE - 13 MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT IN 89- NOTE - 14 711; APLT TO FL DSA IN 89-711 NOTE - 14 IN 10 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/02/21 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MEYERSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOBERMANH FOR - APPELLEE
03/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
07/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD R
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 SEE 86-1566 (206 PGS. - MAJORS) PM PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD CHECK
08/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1987ORDER CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF RT. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 052987 SCHPRD CHECK
09/18/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 28TH ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 091787 SCHPRD STATE
01/19/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM CT RPTR SCHERTZER RE: 2/13/87 RT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD CHECK
04/13/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO MARCH 24TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD STATE
04/22/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD M
08/25/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (13 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD RT
09/02/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 88-1010. EBP PANEL SCDATE 090588 SCHPRD DSA
10/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL APPELLANT'S AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988ORDER DENYING MO FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL. ACG PANELNWTE SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD OPE
01/05/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 88-1578 JB PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD DSA
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/15/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPE
05/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/15/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD OPE
06/12/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-14. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-711 RJG PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD DSA
08/01/1989MEMORANDUM OF APPELLANT CLARIFYING STATUS OF CONSOLIDATED CASES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1989RECEIVED APLE MO TO STAY BRIEFING SCHD (NO BE SET YET) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-711 RJG PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD R
08/23/1989ORDER BA IN 86-1566,-1567,87-371, 88-1010, & -1578 DEEMED BRF IN 89-711; BE DUE IN 30. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-23-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD BE
10/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/25/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD OPA
12/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(JUDGE WINFIELD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/21/1990ARGUED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE
09/21/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2794
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD