Case Information: 40843 | |||
Short Caption: | BURT (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40887 , 40888 , 40889 , 40890 , 40891 , 40937 , 41174 , 41516 , 41517 , 41584 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177149 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/29/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 03-01596 | |
02/05/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[When this appeal was docketed, it appeared that appellant was represented by attorney Garrett T. Ogata. It has become apparent that appellant was acting in proper person in the district court, with Ogata as standby counsel. This appeal is not subject to the provisions of NRAP 3C, and the parties should disregard the fast track notice previously sent by this court.] "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-01956 | |
03/04/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-02122 | |
03/04/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2003. | 03-02122 |