Case: 14-09-00124-CR
14-09-00124-CR
02/03/2009
Aggravated Assault
Alexander Oveal
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/30/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
09/03/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
08/27/2009 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/16/2010 | Case stored | | |||||
04/16/2010 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/14/2010 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
03/22/2010 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
03/22/2010 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||
03/05/2010 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
03/05/2010 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
02/18/2010 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||
02/08/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
02/08/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
02/05/2010 | Supplemental reporters record due | | |||||
02/02/2010 | Submitted | | |||||
01/21/2010 | Order entered | | |||||
12/28/2009 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
10/05/2009 | State brief due | | |||||
09/30/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
09/30/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
09/03/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
09/03/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Extension of time to file GRANTED and document received is ordered filed | | ||||
08/31/2009 | Hearing record filed | | |||||
08/31/2009 | Case reinstated | | |||||
08/28/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
08/27/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
08/27/2009 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||
08/17/2009 | Supplemental clerks record due | | |||||
08/17/2009 | Hearing record due | | |||||
07/16/2009 | Order issued | ABATED | | ||||
07/10/2009 | Response due | | |||||
06/30/2009 | Notice of late brief | | |||||
06/22/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/03/2009 | Response due | | |||||
05/22/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
05/19/2009 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record | | |||||
05/13/2009 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/28/2009 | No reporters record filed in criminal case | | |||||
04/24/2009 | Reporters record due | | |||||
03/31/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
03/30/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
03/30/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
03/24/2009 | Reporters record due | | |||||
03/24/2009 | Record due | | |||||
03/09/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
02/03/2009 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested | | |||||
02/03/2009 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
02/03/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
01/27/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/22/2008 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
11/24/2008 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/16/2035 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Lana S. Shadwick |
Oveal, Alexander | Criminal - Appellant | Brian Middleton |
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable Caprice Cosper
0782415
20 Years TDC