judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BECKMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1718
Short Caption:BECKMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7872-86Filed Date:12/24/1986

Opening Event Date:12/24/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/18/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/10/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Cleveland Thornton YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Heidi M. Pasichow YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BECKMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY UNITED STATES
12/24/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1986APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD DSA
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CLEVELAND THORNTON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 022387 SCHPRD R
04/01/1987MEMORANDUM RE-SENT CJA VOUCHER TO NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL THIS DAY GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 041387 SCHPRD DSA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (48 PGS. - SWAGERTY) PM PANEL SCDATE 051387 SCHPRD RT
08/18/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/18/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/9/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BA
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/9/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD OPE
11/05/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
12/03/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/10/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 121087 SCHPRD BE
01/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 10TH JB PANEL SCDATE 011088 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/10/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD X
02/10/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/10/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 021088 SCHPRD BE
06/21/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/21/1988SUBMITTED PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/19/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD