judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRELL, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1723
Short Caption:TERRELL, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5981-86Filed Date:12/10/1986

Opening Event Date:12/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/16/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Alice J. Hooker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kevin A. Forder YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TERRELL, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOOKERA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FORDERK FOR - APPELLEE
12/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 020987 SCHPRD R
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALICE J. HOOKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (163 PGS - SCHOCH) PB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
11/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/02/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042487 SCHPRD CHECK
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(46 PGS. -- SCHOCH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
12/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF ONE DAY LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 121687 SCHPRD BA
12/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010688 SCHPRD DAS
01/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/18/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD BE
02/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 17TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD BE
03/07/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 3/17/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD N
03/16/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 031788 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/14/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/14/1988ARGUED PANELTERGSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTERGSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/12/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD