judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. LUCAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0257
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. LUCAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 85-CF-0368 Consolidated:87-CF-0257, 88-CF-1468
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6109-84Filed Date:03/11/1987

Opening Event Date:03/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Lucas N
W. Gary KohlmanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John W. Kern YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LUCAS, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES W. SMITH NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 071587 ORDER: SS, CONS 85-368 NOTE - 02 & 87-257; COUNSEL FOR APLT IN NOTE - 03 10 DAYS OTSC WHY APPNTMNT SHLD NOTE - 03 NOT BE VACATED IN 85-368 & NOTE - 04 APLT BE DIR TO FILE A NOTICE NOTE - 04 OF APPEARANCE OF RETAINED NOTE - 05 COUNSEL IN 85-368; FO: COUNSEL NOTE - 05 FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 06 STATE RE: STATUS OF MO FOR RE- NOTE - 06 CONSIDERATION IN TR CT. NOTE - 07 CON 85-368 AND 88-1468 NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 072887 ORDER: VACATE APPNTMNT NOTE - 08 OF W. GARY KOHLMAN, ESQ., IN NOTE - 09 APPEAL #85-368; CLK TO ENTER NOTE - 09 THE APPEARANCE OF W.GARY NOTE - 10 KOHLMAN, ESQ., AS RETAINED NOTE - 10 COUNSEL TO REPRESENT APLT ON NOTE - 11 APPEAL; GRANT MO FOR EXT TO NOTE - 11 FILE BR IN 85-368 TO THE EXTNT NOTE - 12 THAT FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN NOTE - 12 THESE APPEALS ARE HELD IN NOTE - 13 ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION NOTE - 13 IN THE TR CT OF APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 14 RECONSIDERATION; FO: COUNSEL NOTE - 14 FOR APLT TO INFORM THIS CT NOTE - 15 IMMEDIATELY UPON DISPOSITION NOTE - 15 IN THE TR CT OF THE MO FOR NOTE - 16 RECONSIDERATION. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 2/29/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 17 LV TO FILE STMT AND THE CLERK NOTE - 18 IS DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED NOTE - 18 APLT'S STMT. FO THAT COUNSEL NOTE - 19 FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS SHALL NOTE - 19 ADVISE THIS COURT OF THE NOTE - 20 STATUS OF THE MOTION PENDING NOTE - 20 IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 21 1/12/89 ORD: GRANT MO TO CONS NOTE - 21 88-1468 W/85-368 & 87-257; NOTE - 22 APLT TO MAKE STEPS TO HAVE REC NOTE - 22 IN 88-1468 FL; CONS BRF OF NOTE - 23 APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER REC IN NOTE - 23 88-1468 IS FILED. NOTE - 24 3/19/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 24 FOR LV TO FL OPPO & CLK TO FL NOTE - 25 OPPO; GRANT PRO SE MO OF APLT NOTE - 25 FOR LV TO FL SUPP BRF & CLK TO NOTE - 26 FL SUPP BRF; GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 26 FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK NOTE - 27 TO FL REPLY BRF; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 27 APLE FOR LV TO SUPP REC & CLK NOTE - 28 FL AFFIDAVITS AS SUPP REC;DENY NOTE - 28 MO OF APLT TO POSTPONE. NOTE - 29 3/26/90 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 29 COUNSEL SHALL FILE SUPPL. BRFS NOTE - 30 ON OR BEF 4/18/90, ON THE NOTE - 30 ISSUE OF AN INSTRUCTION OF NOTE - 31 PERJURER'S TESTIMONY AND ON NOTE - 31 THE ISSUE OF AN IMMEDIATE NOTE - 32 INSTRUCTION ON PRIOR NOTE - 32 INCONSISTENT STATEMENT.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/03/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KOHLMANW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KERNJ FOR - APPELLEE
03/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/13/1987ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: NO DR/SRT, DSA & FEE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD DR
05/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 13TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD ANSA
05/22/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1987ORDER CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA; APLT'S DR DUE IN 10 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD CHECK
06/04/1987ORDER APLT'S BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 06. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071687 SCHPRD BA
07/22/1987APPEARANCE OF W. GARY KOHLMAN AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT IN 85-368 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO JULY 15TH ORDER IN 85-368 JB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD ANS
07/28/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08 - 16. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TR CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082887 SCHPRD CHECK
10/01/1987STATEMENT OF APLT COUNSEL REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
01/11/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD CHECK
01/29/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO LATE FILE STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD STATE
01/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S 1/29/88 ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17 THRU 20 SL PANELPY SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD N
02/29/1988STATEMENT BY APLT IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S 1/11/88 ORDER SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH 2/29/88 ORDER OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD STATE
04/14/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDERS 2/29/88 & 4/11/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD STATE
07/15/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD CHECK
07/25/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL IN SUP. COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD STATE
09/21/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO FOR RECONS PEND IN THE TR CT. PANELPY SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD CHECK
09/30/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 21ST COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD STATE
10/26/1988ORDER APLT TO FILE BRF IN 30 DAYS & NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD Q
12/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 85-368 & 88-1468 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER MOTION TO CONSOLI- DATE IS RULED ON JB PANEL SCDATE 112588 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 21-23. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD CHECK
04/06/1989RECEIVED LETTER PRO APLT, PRO SE RE ARGUMENT SCHEDULING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 4/2/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 88-1468 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-31-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD BA
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/31/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071389 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 21, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/02/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/21/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/5/89 (NO OPE) PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/5/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 083189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF NUNC PRO TUNC GG PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1989RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD OPE
11/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 28, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111189 SCHPRD BE
11/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-29-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD V
03/07/1990RECEIVED PRO SE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BREIF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1990APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OT OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/19/1990ARGUED PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 24-28. DAS PANELBESTSC SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD OPE
03/19/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO PRO SE MO FOR LV TO FL SUPP BRF. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM PRO SE. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD AFFIDAVITS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE SCOTT DATED 3-14-90) IN 85-368 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PRO SE SUPP. BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 29 THRU 32 SL PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/21/90 REPLY OF APLT TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD CHECK
04/18/1990APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO & APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF JOINTLY TO APRIL 27, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 041890 SCHPRD SMA
04/26/1990ORDER JOINT MOT FOR EXT TO FL SUPP BRFS GRANTED TO 4/27/90. MEH PANELBESTSC SCDATE 042490 SCHPRD VS
04/27/1990APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOTO MAY 4, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD SME
05/04/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO FOR EXT TO FL SUPP BRF TO 5/4/90. MEH PANELBESTSC SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD VS
05/04/1990APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AJ PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD SME
05/07/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTED SME TO DIVISION. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO REPLY TO APLE'S SUPP. (REPLY) BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD
05/24/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S PRO SE MO FOR EXT TO FL REPLY TO SME TO 5/30/90. MEH PANELBESTSC SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD VS
05/30/1990APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO NUNC PRO TUNC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990RECEIVED APLT'S SUPP. BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APLE'S OPPO TO MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A REPLY TO APLE'S SUP BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF NUNC PRO TUNC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL SUP BRF; APLE MAY FILE REPLY IN 10 DAYS MEH PANELBESTSC SCDATE 053090 SCHPRD SME
08/22/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/05/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1990ORDER THAT APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH/REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1990APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO PET. FOR REH/REH EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 100290 SCHPRD ANSE
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD