judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALKER, ALPHONZO UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1671
Short Caption:WALKER, ALPHONZO UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Destruction Of Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9058-86Filed Date:12/04/1986

Opening Event Date:12/04/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen F. BrennwaldNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, ALPHONZO UNITED STATES
12/04/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/26/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 020287 SCHPRD R
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN F. BRENNWALD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 032787 SCHPRD DSA
11/02/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(35 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 033087 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 14TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BA
02/11/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR VACATE APPNTMT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011488 SCHPRD BA
02/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/07/1988ORDER GRT MO OF COURT-APPTD COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW APPEAL AND DISMISSING THIS APPEAL SL PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD N
03/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
03/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD