judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GILLIAMS, THADDEUS L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1716
Short Caption:GILLIAMS, THADDEUS L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead:86-CM-1716Consolidated: 89-CM-0308
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6794-86Filed Date:12/19/1986

Opening Event Date:12/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas D. EngleNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Elizabeth Tacy JesterYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GILLIAMS, THADDEUS L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/12/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATED APPM NOTE - 02 OF THOMAS D. ENGLE & APPT NOTE - 02 ELIZABETH TACY JESTER FOR APLT NOTE - 03 NW COUNSL FOR APLT TO FL STATE NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS INDICATING EST NOTE - 04 COMPLETION DATE OF RT ORDERED. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 1/11/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 05 STAY AND ALL PROC. IN THIS NOTE - 06 APPEAL ARE HEREBY STAYED PDG NOTE - 06 DISP. OF 23-110 MO FILED IN NOTE - 07 TRIAL COURT. FO THAT CNSL FOR NOTE - 07 APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO ADVISE NOTE - 08 THIS CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO NOTE - 08 PDG IN TRIAL CT. FAILURE OF NOTE - 09 CNSL TO NOTIFY THIS CT W/I 5 NOTE - 09 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF NOTICE NOTE - 10 OF DISP. OF MO PDG IN TRIAL CT NOTE - 10 WILL BE CONSIDERED NOTE - 11 NON-COMPLIANCE WITH THE GEN. NOTE - 11 RULES OF THIS CT AND CAN NOTE - 12 RESULT IN CNSL'S NAME BEING NOTE - 12 REMOVED FROM THE PANEL OF NOTE - 13 ATTYS TO RECEIVE APPTMTS IN NOTE - 13 PROC. COVERED BY CJA. NOTE - 14 3/28/89 ORD: DENY APLT'S NOTE - 14 REQUEST FOR A FURTHER STAY W/O NOTE - 15 PREJ. TO APLT MOVING TO NOTE - 15 CONSOLIDATE APPEALS WHEN THE NOTE - 16 SECOND NOTICE OF APPEAL IS NOTE - 16 FILED. FO THAT THE BRF OF APLT NOTE - 17 SHALL BE FILED W/I 40 DAYS FM NOTE - 17 DATE OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 18 3/31/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE NOTE - 18 CONSOLIDATING NOS. 86-1716 AND NOTE - 19 89-308 FOR ALL PURPOSES. FO NOTE - 19 THAT ELIZABETH T. JESTER, ESQ. NOTE - 20 IS HEREBY APPTD TO REPRESENT NOTE - 20 APLT IN NO. 89-308 AND THAT NOTE - 21 CNSL IS DIRTD TO FILE THE DKTG NOTE - 21 STMT IN NO. 89-308 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 22 CON: 89-308 NOTE - 22
01/01/1906 ENGLET VACATED 4/12/88.
12/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPOINT) PANEL SCDATE 021887 SCHPRD R
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS D. ENGLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 032787 SCHPRD DSA
07/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (7 PGS.- DAVIS) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (133 PGS - HUNT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF THADDEUS GILLIAMS AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELIZABETH TACY JESTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD GG
05/02/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 10/30/86 RT BY 7/31/88-ABSOLUTELY NFX|||| EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO APRIL 12TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988LETTER DATED 5/1/88 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (37 PGS RT - TARCZA) GT PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/31/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD BA
01/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 13 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD N
01/18/1989STATEMENT OF APLT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PENDG IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD STATE
03/01/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PER COURT'S ORDER DATED 1/11/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/28/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14 THRU 17 SL PANELRO SCDATE 031689 SCHPRD Q
03/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 18 THRU 22 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-308 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BA
06/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/6/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD CHECK
07/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD