judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MYERS III, GUY H. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1715
Short Caption:MYERS III, GUY H. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7783-86Filed Date:12/22/1986

Opening Event Date:12/22/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/18/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Joseph R. Conte YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Helen M. Bollwerk YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MYERS III, GUY H. UNITED STATES
12/22/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1986APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 010287 SCHPRD DSA
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. CONTE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 022087 SCHPRD R
02/07/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE RT (NAME OF RPTR, DATE ORD, EST. DATE) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD STATE
06/07/1989ORDER APLT TO FL STATE IN 20 DAYS AS TO STATUS OR RT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
06/12/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRASNCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 062789 SCHPRD STATE
07/14/1989ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. (RECORD IS COMPLETE) ACG PANELRBH SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD U
08/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/4/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD BA
09/05/1989RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD N
10/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 17, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD BE
11/13/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BE TO AND INCLUDING 11/17/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
11/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/03/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(34-PGS/TROUPE) JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD