Case Information: 40831 | |||
Short Caption: | MONROY (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41428 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C186768 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 03-01530 | |
02/03/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 12, 2002, January 8, 2003 and January 15, 2003. Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn and Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: not filed in district court. | 03-01817 | |
02/13/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/12/02; 1/8/03. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 03-02565 | |
03/11/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 17, 2003. | 03-04039 | |
03/19/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-04676 | |
03/19/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-04677 | |
03/19/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | ||
03/26/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Appellant's Fast Track Statement & Appellant's Appendix). | 03-05125 | |
04/09/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-05941 | |
04/09/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 03-05942 | |
06/06/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-09481 | |
07/01/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-09994 | |
07/01/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/31/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 3, 2003. | 03-09994 |