judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN B. MCKINNEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0267
Short Caption:JOHN B. MCKINNEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10168-86Filed Date:03/12/1987

Opening Event Date:03/12/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/29/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn B. Mckinney N
Hugh O'Neill NN
AppellantJohn B. Mckinney N
Rufus W. Mckinney, Jr.YY
AppellantJohn B. Mckinney N
Boniface K. CobbinaNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Jock A. Banks YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCKINNEY, JOHN B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: EDDIE PEOPLES NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 032288 ORD: GRANT MO TO W/DRAW NOTE - 02 & VACATE APPTMENT OF HUGH NOTE - 03 O'NEILL & APPT RUFUS W. NOTE - 03 MCKINNEY, JR. TO REPRESENT NOTE - 04 APLT ON APPEAL; FORMER COUNSEL NOTE - 04 TO TRANSMIT ALL PAPERS NOTE - 05 INCLUDING RT TO NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 05 COUNSEL; APLT BRF DUE IN 40 NOTE - 06 DAYS. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 7/1/88 ORD: VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 07 RUFUS W. MCKINNEY & REFER TO NOTE - 08 BPR; APPT BONIFACE K. COBBINA NOTE - 08 FOR APLT;RUFUS MCKINNEY TO NOTE - 09 TRANSMIT ALL DOCUMENTS TO NEW NOTE - 09 COUNSEL; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 NOTE - 10 DAYS. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 8/2/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSEL NOTE - 11 FOR APLT TO BE REAPPTD & VACAT NOTE - 12 APPMT OF BONIFACE COBBINA & NOTE - 12 RE-APPT RUFUS W. MCKINNEY FOR NOTE - 13 APLT; CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; NOTE - 13 BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.
01/01/1906 O'NEILLH VACATED BY 3/22/88 ORDER. MCKINNEYR REAPPOINTED 8/2/88. COBBINAB VACATED 8/2/88.
03/12/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HUGH O'NEILL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD CHECK
05/12/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD DSA
05/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 051187 SCHPRD R
05/19/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (294 PGS - PAVLISH) PB PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD RT
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 28TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1987ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 5 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD OPE
11/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
11/30/1987LETTER ANDERS LETTER TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE 12/28/87. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: THE STATUS OF THE MOTION TO W/D. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RUFUS W. McKINNEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-06 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD TMC
06/10/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BRIEF OR VACATE APPNTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050288 SCHPRD BA
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 20 DAY EXTENSION OR TO 7/11/88 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
07/01/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BONIFACE K. COBBINA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-10. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD Q
07/11/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF PRIOR COUNSEL FOR REINSTATE MENT OF APPOINTMENT & FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF FOR PRIOR COUNSEL (RUFUS MCKINNEY JR.) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-13. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072788 SCHPRD Q
08/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 090288 SCHPRD BE
09/09/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/2/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
10/04/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF NO OPA AD PB PANEL SCDATE 100288 SCHPRD BE
10/04/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/20/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD CHECK
03/29/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/29/1989SUBMITTED PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD