judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CATTON, CLIVE W. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1639
Short Caption:CATTON, CLIVE W. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead: 86-CM-1385 Consolidated:86-CM-1639
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6393-86Filed Date:11/12/1986

Opening Event Date:11/12/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/11/1987
Argued/Submitted:10/20/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Helen Pitts Miller YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth K. Lee YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CATTON, CLIVE W. UNITED STATES
11/12/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/11/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/20/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/21/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition