Case Information: 40840 | |||
Short Caption: | PHILLIPS (TERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43792 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177863 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/04/2003 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/29/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 03-01592 | |
02/19/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] | 03-02765 | |
03/03/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 7, 2003. Court Reporter: Shirley Prawalsky | 03-03437 | |
04/04/2003 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Sealed pre-sentence report after page 185. | 03-05717 | |
04/04/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/13/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be remanded to the district court for an evidentiary hearing. | 04-00780 | |
01/28/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 04-01841 | |
02/10/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted in this matter. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn6[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal from an order of the district court denying Phillips' appeal deprivation claim and the claims not reached in this order shall be docketed as a new matter. We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that Phillips is entitled only to the relief described herein.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-02596 | |
03/09/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-02625 | |
03/09/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/29/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 2004. | 04-02625 |