judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WEST, MICHAEL G. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1691
Short Caption:WEST, MICHAEL G. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead: 86-CM-1627 Consolidated:86-CM-1691
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3257-86Filed Date:11/28/1986

Opening Event Date:11/28/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/07/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/10/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paul F. Kemp YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WEST, MICHAEL G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFTS: MICHAEL JOHNSON -86- NOTE - 01 1628; BRIAN JENKINS -86-1627; NOTE - 02 MICHAEL A. WEST; NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 071087 ORDER: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 03 SHELBY D. GREEN, ESQ., TO W/DR NOTE - 04 & VACATING APPOINTMENT; FO: NOTE - 04 PAUL F. KEMP, ESQ., HEREBY NOTE - 05 APPOINTED TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 05 ON APPEAL; FO: NEWLY APPOINTED NOTE - 06 COUNSEL W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 06 STATE RE: STATUS OF RT, INCLDG NOTE - 07 THE NAME OF CT. REPORTERS PRE- NOTE - 07 PARING RT, ESTIMATED # OF PGS, NOTE - 08 & ESTIMATED COMPLETION DATE OF NOTE - 08 RT. NOTE - 09 CON 86-1627 NOTE - 09
01/01/1906 GREENSH VACATED 7/10/87
11/28/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SHELBY D. GREEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 012787 SCHPRD R
05/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (26 PGS TRANS-TARCZA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 022787 SCHPRD RT
05/21/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF SHELBY D. GREEN AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD BA
07/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL F. KEMP, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD CHECK
07/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (24 PGS. - MATO) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO COM- PLY W/JULY 10, 1987 ORDER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD STATE
08/17/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO AUGUST 12TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD STATE
11/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (148 PGS - TOOBY) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (232 PGS - HAWKINS) PB PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD RT
08/26/1988ORDER SS, CONS 86-1627 & 86-1691; APLTS BRS DUE IN 40 DAYS & CON BR OF APLE 30 DAYS AFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/20/88 IN NO. 86-1627 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN #86-1627 TO TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM DATE THIS MOTION IS GRANTED (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 102088 SCHPRD BA
12/05/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/15/88. PB PANELRO SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/20/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 86-1627 DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 86-1627 FR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BA IN THIS CASE DUE IN 10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD CHECK
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/3/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 020389 SCHPRD BE
01/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH #86-1627 & TO SET TIME FOR APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO TO CONSOLIDATE APPEAL AND CON BRF OF APLE DUE ON OR BEFORE 3/7/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD Q
03/17/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRIEF TO 4/7/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD V
03/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(4 PGS/HAWKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/07/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (32 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/10/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD