judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREEN, RODNEY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1714
Short Caption:GREEN, RODNEY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Lead:86-CM-1714Consolidated: 86-CM-1724
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9967-86Filed Date:12/19/1986

Opening Event Date:12/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/18/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/26/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John T. Riely NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
David C. Gray YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ellen Bass YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREEN, RODNEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 082887 ORDER: SS, CONS 86-1714 NOTE - 01 & 8601724; GRANT MO FOR EXT TO NOTE - 02 FILE BR; APLT'S BRFS IN NOS. NOTE - 02 86-1714 & 86-1724 DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 03 AFTER RT IS FILED; FO: COUNSEL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 04 STATEMENTS W/THIS COURT RE: NOTE - 04 STATUS OF RT. NOTE - 05 CON 86-1724 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 10/22/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 06 JOHN T. RILEY TO W/D APPMT OF NOTE - 07 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 86-1714 & NOTE - 07 APPT DAVID C. GRAY TO RPRESENT NOTE - 08 APLT IN 86-1714; BRF OF APLTS NOTE - 08 DUE IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 RIELYJ WITHDRAWN 10/22/87.
12/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN T. RIELY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 021887 SCHPRD R
03/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 032787 SCHPRD DSA
04/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD BA
08/28/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 051187 SCHPRD OPE
08/31/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (9 PGS - SMITH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 091787 SCHPRD STATE
10/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (101 PGS - FINNERIN) PB PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
10/09/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF JOHN T. RIELY AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL NUNC PRO TUNC TO 3/17/87; DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-08. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101487 SCHPRD CHECK
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (5 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 29, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BE
01/26/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/26/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD BE
05/26/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 544 A.2d 714
07/21/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1378
08/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD