judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEWART, TYRONE L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1532
Short Caption:STEWART, TYRONE L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M15057-85Filed Date:11/04/1986

Opening Event Date:11/04/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/17/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard K. Gilbert YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STEWART, TYRONE L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/10/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GILBERTR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DANELLOE FOR - APPELLEE
11/04/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD K. GILBERT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD R
04/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 052387 SCHPRD BA
09/02/1987ORDER SS, THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080187 SCHPRD RT
09/10/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 2ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD STATE
10/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (332 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/06/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/06/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 010688 SCHPRD BE
01/25/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL FO 10/17/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD OPE
10/17/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/17/1988ARGUED SL PANELPYNWSC SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CSUM
10/18/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL SL PANELPYNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/08/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD