judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILLIGAN, WILLIE D. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1516
Short Caption:MILLIGAN, WILLIE D. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6923-86Filed Date:10/27/1986

Opening Event Date:10/27/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/04/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/29/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Samuel Ed Wilhite NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joyce J. Bang YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILLIGAN, WILLIE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MARK FREEMAN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 040389 ORD: GRANT CRT-APTD NOTE - 02 COUNSEL MO TO W/DRAW TO THE NOTE - 03 EXTENT THAT THE APPTMENT OF NOTE - 03 SAMUEL E. WILHITE, ESQ., IS NOTE - 04 VACATED & MACK E. DAVIS, ESQ., NOTE - 04 IS APPTD TO REPRESENT APLT ON NOTE - 05 APPEAL; FORMER COUNSEL TO NOTE - 05 TRANSMIT ALL PAPERS TO NEW NOTE - 06 COUNSEL; APLT BRF DUE IN 40 NOTE - 06 DAYS.
01/01/1906 WILHITEE VACATED BY THE 3/29/89 ORDER
10/27/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 122686 SCHPRD R
01/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ED WILHITE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (188 PGS.- CARTER) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (166 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 022787 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD BA
11/12/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) MLH PANEL SCDATE 111287 SCHPRD BA
11/17/1987LETTER ANDERS LETTER TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 12/16/87. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MACK E. DAVIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-06 ACG PANELROST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-5-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/5/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD M
06/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD BA
06/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/4/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BE
08/01/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MO. TO FILE BRF AND BRF OF APLE DUE BY 8/4/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD N
08/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 080489 SCHPRD BE
08/04/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/29/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRF & BRF IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD OPA
02/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/06/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD